FL H1191 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 800 (Ch. 2017-94)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 800 (Ch. 2017-94)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain health insurers & HMOs to provide medication synchronization under certain circumstances; authorizes use of alternate process for dispensing prescription drugs under specified circumstances.
Title
Medication Synchronization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 800 (Ch. 2017-94) |
2017-05-02 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 800 |
2017-05-01 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/17 |
2017-04-27 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2017-04-24 | House | CS/CS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17 |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-24 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-04-24 | House | CS/CS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/24/17, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2017-04-21 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-04-20 | House | CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time |
2017-04-20 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-04-19 | House | CS/CS by Commerce Committee; YEAS 26 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/19/17, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2017-03-29 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | CS referred to Commerce Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2017-03-28 | House | CS by Health Innovation Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-28 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-27 | House | CS by Health Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-23 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Innovation Subcommittee, 03/27/17, 12:30 pm, Mashburn Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Health Innovation Subcommittee; Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-03-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S800 (Same As) 2017-06-15 - Chapter No. 2017-94
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 64196 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |