FL H1189 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-3)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-159
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits life insurers & long-term care insurers from canceling, limiting, or denying coverage, or establishing differentials in premium rates based on genetic information; prohibits such insurers from taking certain actions relating to genetic information for any insurance purpose.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Genetic Information for Insurance Purposes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#737 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#20 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#412 (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01 Chapter No. 2020-159
2020-06-30 Approved by Governor
2020-06-17 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-12HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2020-03-12HousePassed as amended; YEAS 110 NAYS 0
2020-03-12HouseConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (624566)
2020-03-11HouseIn returning messages
2020-03-11SenatePassed as amended; YEAS 35 NAYS 3
2020-03-11SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-10SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-10SenateAmendment(s) adopted (624566)
2020-03-10SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-10SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 1564
2020-03-10SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-10SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2020-02-12SenateReceived
2020-02-10SenateReferred to Rules
2020-02-05SenateIn Messages
2020-01-29HousePassed; YEAS 117 NAYS 1
2020-01-29HouseRead 3rd time
2020-01-29HouseRead 2nd time
2020-01-23HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/29/20
2020-01-23HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-23HouseFavorable by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
2020-01-21HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 01/23/20, 9:30 am, Webster Hall
2020-01-16HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2020-01-16HouseFavorable by Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 01/16/20, 12:30 pm, Morris Hall
2020-01-13HouseReferred to Health and Human Services Committee; Commerce Committee
2020-01-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1564 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 1189

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6274301Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback