FL H1189 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires statewide ground vibration be based on frequency & particle velocity; provides duties of State Fire Marshal relating to regulations relating to blasting operations & complaint reports regarding blasting operations conducted in connection with construction materials mining activities; provides requirements relating to training & continuing education for persons engaged in construction materials mining activities; requires that certain mining permits be issued for period of 5 years; requires State Fire Marshal to suspend mining permits issued on or after specified date; requires State Fire Marshal to submit report to Legislature by specified date.
Title
Construction Materials Mining Activities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1356 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1189 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1189/BillText/Filed/PDF |