FL H1189 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals assistive truck platooning technology pilot project; revises provisions relating to platoon vehicle operation, commercial motor vehicle safety regulations & penalties, apportionable vehicle requirements, certain license plate fees, vehicles registered under International Registration Plan, & theft of certain commercial cargo; authorizes DHSMV to partner with tax collector to conduct Fleet Vehicle Temporary Tag pilot program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial Motor Vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#681 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Transportation
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-02SenateReceived
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2018-03-01SenateIn Messages
2018-03-01HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
2018-03-01HouseAmendment(s) adopted (514759) 740
2018-03-01HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-28HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-28HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18
2018-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-12HouseCS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time
2018-02-09HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-08HouseCS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2018-02-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/08/18, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2018-01-22HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2018-01-22HouseFavorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2018-01-18HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 01/22/18, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall
2018-01-16HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2018-01-16HouseFavorable by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 01/16/18, 3:00 pm, Reed Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-07HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Government Accountability Committee
2018-01-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1104 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
H1359 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
H1287 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3160896Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3160897Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
812014Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback