FL H1187 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires DACS to provide specified reimbursements to sponsors for certain breakfast meals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reduced-price School Breakfast Meals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-10HouseNow in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2022-01-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1656 (Similar To) 2022-01-14 - On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/19/22, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
595405Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback