FL H1187 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-68
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-68
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides powers & duties of clerk of court relating to guardianships; prohibits certain fees and cost incurred by guardian from being paid or reimbursed by ward's assets; authorizes certain guardians of property to provide confidential information to clerk or to an Office of Public & Professional Guardians investigator; provides duty to maintain confidentiality of certain information.
Title
Guardianship
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#694 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#694 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Chapter No. 2018-68 | |
2018-03-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-14 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2018-03-06 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2018-03-06 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 1 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1002 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Received |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2018-03-01 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-03-01 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 747 |
2018-03-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-02-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18 |
2018-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-12 | House | CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2018-02-09 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-02-07 | House | CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/07/18, 10:30 am, Morris Hall |
2018-01-30 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 01/30/18, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2018-01-23 | House | Now in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee |
2018-01-23 | House | Favorable by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, 12 HOB |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-07 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1002 (Same As) 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1187
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
744 | 2104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 368 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 3701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 444 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |