FL H1185 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to state, state university, & community college employee lobbyists; prohibits certain public service announcements by specified entities or persons; prohibits certain public officers & employees from soliciting employment & contractual relationships; provides exception & disclosure requirements; revises lobbyist registration, compensation report, principal designation cancellation, & investigation requirements.
Title
Ethics Reform
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#502 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2020-03-03 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-02-26 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-20 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/26/20 |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-13 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/13/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-01-24 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-24 | House | CS referred to State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-24 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee |
2020-01-23 | House | CS by Public Integrity and Ethics Committee read 1st time |
2020-01-23 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-23 | House | CS by Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Public Integrity and Ethics Committee, 01/23/20, 9:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1530 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
106 | 114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 5061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |