FL H1179 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all public employers to comply with certain federal OSHA standards by certain date; requires DFS to report injury & illness data for public employers to Governor, President of Senate, & Speaker of the House of Representatives & publish such data on department's website; requires department to provide certain information on its website by certain date.
Title
Workplace Safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Government Operations Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 115 | |
2012-01-09 | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 115 | |
2012-01-03 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1179 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1179/BillText/Filed/PDF |