FL H1179 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (634602) -HJ 1145
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (634602) -HJ 1145
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes creation of s. 28, Art. I of State Constitution; prohibits public funding of abortions; provides exceptions; prohibits State Constitution from being interpreted to create broader rights to abortion than those contained in U.S. Constitution.
Title
Abortion/Public Funding/Construction of Rights
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#303 (Y: 82 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#283 (Y: 37 N: 76 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#282 (Y: 36 N: 75 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#281 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#303 (Y: 82 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#283 (Y: 37 N: 76 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#282 (Y: 36 N: 75 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#281 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (634602) -HJ 1145 | |
2011-04-29 | In returning messages | |
2011-04-28 | Read 3rd time -SJ 551 | |
2011-04-27 | In Messages | |
2011-04-27 | Read 3rd time -HJ 809 | |
2011-04-26 | Read 2nd time -HJ 781 | |
2011-04-22 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/11 | |
2011-04-21 | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 4 -HJ 762 | |
2011-04-19 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/21/11, 11:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2011-04-15 | Now in Judiciary Committee -HJ 659 | |
2011-04-14 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-04-13 | CS by Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 6 -HJ 645 | |
2011-04-11 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/13/11, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 219 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 103 | |
2011-03-03 | Filed |