FL H1175 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-187
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-187
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that motor vehicle dealer who constructs/alters sales/service facilities in reliance upon program/incentive offered by applicant/licensee is in compliance with certain requirements for specified period; specifies eligibility for benefits under revised/new program/incentive; authorizes denial, suspension, or revocation of license of applicant/licensee who establishes certain performance measurement criteria having material/adverse effect on dealers; requires applicant, licensee, or common entity, or affiliate thereof, under certain circumstances & upon request of dealer, to describe in writing how criteria were designed, calculated, established, & uniformly applied.
Title
Motor Vehicle Manufacturers and Dealers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#24 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#214 (Y: 104 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#214 (Y: 104 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Chapter No. 2017-187 | |
2017-06-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-06-14 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-05-05 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2017-05-05 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1678 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from Transportation; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2017-04-26 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-04-26 | House | CS passed; YEAS 104 NAYS 12 |
2017-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time 818 |
2017-04-20 | House | CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time |
2017-04-20 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/17 |
2017-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-20 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-04-19 | House | CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 24 NAYS 3 |
2017-04-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/19/17, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2017-03-31 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | CS referred to Commerce Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee |
2017-03-30 | House | CS by Careers and Competition Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-30 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-28 | House | CS by Careers and Competition Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 6 |
2017-03-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Careers and Competition Subcommittee, 03/28/17, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2017-03-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1047 (Similar To) 2017-02-28 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1175 (Ch. 2017-187)
S1678 (Similar To) 2017-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1175 (Ch. 2017-187)
S1678 (Similar To) 2017-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1175 (Ch. 2017-187)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 60 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 615 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 63 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 6403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 6405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 641 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 6412 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 6415 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 642 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 643 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 644 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 645 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 646 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 648 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 664 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 67 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 68 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 69 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 695 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 696 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 697 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 6975 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 698 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 699 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 69915 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 6992 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 70 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |