FL H1175 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes landowners of constrained parcels to seek amendment to local government comprehensive plan; provides timeframe for local government & landowner to agree to schedule & to negotiate consensus on consistency of uses, densities, & intensities; establishes presumption that amendment is not urban sprawl under certain circumstances; requires local government to transmit amendment to state land planning agency for review; limits local government's authority to establish specified prohibitions on constrained parcels; exempts specified property.
Title
Constrained Agricultural Parcels
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee |
2015-03-08 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1244 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Community Affairs
H0933 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1216 (Ch. 2015-30)
H0933 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1216 (Ch. 2015-30)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
163 | 3162 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3164 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1175 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1175/BillText/Filed/PDF |