FL H1175 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates "School Safety Act of Broward County"; creates independent special district to provide school security & mental health referral services for students and staff; provides for governing board, Broward School Safety Board; provides for ad valorem assessment; requires referendum.
Title
Broward County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Education Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0873 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
S0514 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
S0514 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1175 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1175/BillText/Filed/PDF |