FL H1175 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises legislative intent relating to certain rules of DEP & water management districts relating to mitigation; revises criteria for issuing permits for projects affecting surface waters & wetlands; requires department to provide training & guidance for application of uniform mitigation assessment method, etc.
Title
Management and Storage of Surface Waters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Natural Resources Appropriations (CGHC); General Government Policy Council -HJ 00105 | |
2010-03-01 | Referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Natural Resources Appropriations (CGHC); General Government Policy Council | |
2010-02-22 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S2238 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Environmental Preservation and Conservation
H7177 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 550 (Ch. 2010-205)
H7177 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 550 (Ch. 2010-205)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0373 | 4135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0373 | 414 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |