FL H1173 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies payment intangibles, accounts, & proceeds thereof are subject to judgment liens; removes provision specifying priority of liens; specifies validity & enforceability of liens against motor vehicles & vessels; specifies restrictions on enforcement of judgment liens; prohibits issuing motor vehicle certificate of title under certain circumstances; specifies procedures for judgment lienholder to place lien on motor vehicles or vessels; revises authority of certain persons to demand & receive lien satisfaction; requires lienholder to enter satisfaction in certificate of title upon satisfaction or lapse of judgment lien.
Title
Judgment Liens
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - House - House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-04 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-02-04 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-04 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-02-02 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-02 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-02 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-02 | House | Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-02-02 | House | Favorable with CS by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-01-31 | House | Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-01-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1758 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
319 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
319 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
55 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
55 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
55 | 208 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
55 | 209 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
56 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |