FL H1173 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires local governments to address protection of private property rights in comprehensive plans; requires comprehensive plan to include property rights element that addresses certain objectives; requires counties & municipalities to adopt land development regulations consistent with property rights element; provides deadlines for local governments to adopt private property rights element; requires state land planning agency to approve private property rights element adopted by local government if it substantially complies with specified form.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Growth Management

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-11HouseDied in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee
2016-01-13HouseReferred to Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee
2016-01-12HouseIntroduced
2016-01-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1560 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Community Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1633167Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1633177Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback