FL H1173 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to delivery of notices for code violations; authorizes immediate issuance of citations for specified code violations; provides municipalities with certain authority relating to foreclosure on abatement assessment liens against real property & assignment of such liens to private parties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enforcement/County & Municipal Codes & Ordinances

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-14 Referred to Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 219
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 102
2011-03-03 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
17301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
17303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
17304Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback