FL H1169 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter No. 2017-194
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Designates Officer Charles "Charlie K" Kondek, Jr., Memorial Highway in Pinellas County; directs DOT to erect suitable markers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Facility Designations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#216 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-28 Chapter No. 2017-194
2017-06-23 Approved by Governor
2017-06-14 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2017-04-27HouseOrdered enrolled
2017-04-27SenatePassed; YEAS 33 NAYS 0
2017-04-27SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-27SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-27SenateSubstituted for SB 1390
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-04-27SenateWithdrawn from Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2017-04-26SenateReceived
2017-04-26SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2017-04-26SenateIn Messages
2017-04-26HousePassed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
2017-04-26HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-25HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-04-25HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-20HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/17
2017-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-04-19HouseFavorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
2017-04-17HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 04/19/17, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2017-04-03HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2017-04-03HouseFavorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2017-03-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/03/17, 11:30 am, Sumner Hall
2017-03-28HouseNow in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2017-03-28HouseFavorable by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2017-03-24HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 03/28/17, 8:00 am, Reed Hall
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-03-06HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-03-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1390 (Same As) 2017-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1169 (Ch. 2017-194)

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback