FL H1167 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that certain exemptions from court-related fees & charges apply to certain entities; requires court to waive any court costs or filing fees for certain proceedings involving public guardians; provides that certain examination report related to annual guardianship plans may be prepared by physician assistant or advanced practice registered nurse.
Title
Courts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 345 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 2008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 3675 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1167 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1167/BillText/Filed/PDF |