FL H1165 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Local Government Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides conditions under which neighborhood improvement district may borrow money contract loans, & issue bonds, certificates, warrants, notes, or other evidence of indebtedness & may pledge special assessment power of district to pay such debts for purpose of financing certain capital projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City of Lauderhill, Broward County

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied in Local Government Affairs Subcommittee
2015-03-08HouseReferred to Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-27HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback