FL H1163 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises qualification requirements person must meet in order to take water well contractor license examination; prohibits person or business entity from advertising water well drilling or construction services in specified circumstances; requires rules adopted by DEP relating to location of onsite sewage treatment & disposal systems allow licensed water well contractor to apply for & receive variance for installation of private or public potable water well; provides DEP's variance review & advisory committee is not responsible for reviewing water well permitting; requires committee to consider certain requirements when making recommendations on variance requests.
Title
Regulation of Water Resources
Sponsors
House Infrastructure Strategies Committee | House Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee | Sen. Stan McClain [R] | Sen. Tom Leek [R] |
Rep. Johanna Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - House - House Infrastructure Strategies Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | Laid on Table |
2024-02-15 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-15 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2024-02-12 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/15/2024) |
2024-02-09 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-09 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-08 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2024-02-08 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-08 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-08 | House | Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Favorable with CS by Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda |
2024-01-29 | House | Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | Original reference removed: Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-26 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-01-26 | House | CS Filed |
2024-01-26 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-01-26 | House | Reported out of Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee |
2024-01-24 | House | Favorable with CS by Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee |
2024-01-22 | House | PCS added to Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-09 | House | Now in Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee |
2024-01-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1136 (Similar To) 2024-05-07 - Chapter No. 2024-143
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
373 | 323 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 333 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 336 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 0065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |