FL H1161 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Public Integrity and Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Ratifies proposed amendment to U.S. Constitution relating to equal rights for men & women.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Equal Rights for Men and Women

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Public Integrity and Ethics Committee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-07HouseReferred to Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; Judiciary Committee; Rules and Policy Committee
2018-01-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S264 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
H103 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Withdrawn prior to introduction

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback