FL H1159 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-01 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires certain contract documents to include specified provision that provides liability limits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contractual Services Contract Liability Limits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-31 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01HouseLaid on Table
2023-04-25HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2023-04-25HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2023-04-20HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
2023-04-20HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2023-04-20HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2023-04-13HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2023)
2023-04-03HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2023-04-03House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
2023-04-03HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2023-03-31HouseCS Filed
2023-03-31HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2023-03-31HouseReported out of State Affairs Committee
2023-03-31HouseFavorable with CS by State Affairs Committee
2023-03-29HouseAdded to State Affairs Committee agenda
2023-03-23House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2023-03-23HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2023-03-23HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2023-03-23HouseOriginal reference removed: State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2023-03-22HouseCS Filed
2023-03-22HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2023-03-22HouseReported out of Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
2023-03-22HouseFavorable with CS by Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
2023-03-20HousePCS added to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee agenda
2023-03-07House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2023-03-06HouseNow in Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
2023-03-06HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2023-03-06HouseReferred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2023-03-06HouseReferred to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
2023-02-24HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1188 (Similar To) 2023-06-30 - Vetoed by Governor

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100284Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2870571Amended CodeSee Bill Text
287058Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1159
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1159/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1159/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1159/BillText/c2/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1159/Amendment/882041/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1159/Analyses/h1159.CRG.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1159/Analyses/h1159a.SAC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1159/Analyses/h1159b.SAC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1159/Analyses/h1159z.CRG.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1159/Analyses/h1159z1.CRG.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=67651&IsPCB=1&BillId=77942
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=68441&IsPCB=0&BillId=77942

Bill Comments

feedback