FL H1159 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-155
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits local governments from requiring notices, applications, approvals, permits, fees, or mitigation for pruning, trimming, or removal of trees on residential property if property owner obtains specified documentation; prohibits local governments from requiring property owners to replant such trees; provides exception for mangrove protection actions; deletes provision that authorizes electric utilities to perform certain right-of-way tree maintenance only if property owner has received local government approval; creates Property Owner Bill of Rights; requires county property appraisers to provide specified information on their websites.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Private Property Rights

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#42 (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#252 (Y: 77 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27 Chapter No. 2019-155
2019-06-26 Approved by Governor
2019-06-25 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-04-26HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-04-26SenateCS passed; YEAS 22 NAYS 16
2019-04-26SenateRead 3rd time 578
2019-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-26SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 1400
2019-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-26SenateWithdrawn from Community Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
2019-04-25SenateReceived
2019-04-25SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
2019-04-25SenateIn Messages
2019-04-25HouseCS passed; YEAS 77 NAYS 36
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-25HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/19
2019-04-20HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-18HouseCS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
2019-04-18HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-18HouseCS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 4
2019-04-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/18/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-04-04HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-04-04HouseFavorable by Commerce Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 4
2019-04-02HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/04/19, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2019-03-19HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2019-03-19HouseFavorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 3
2019-03-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 8:00 am, 12 HOB
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Commerce Committee; State Affairs Committee
2019-02-28HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1400 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1159 (Ch. 2019-155)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
163045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1633209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
70002Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback