FL H1159 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOE to create model policy designed to protect students from bullying & harassment; requires public K-12 educational institution to designate school employee as counselor for students suffering from bullying or harassment; requires DOE to approve, produce, & provide training materials.
Title
Bullying or Harassment
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Cruz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to K-20 Competitiveness Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee -HJ 219 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 100 | |
2011-03-03 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1159 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1159/BillText/Filed/HTML |