FL H1153 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Workforce Florida, Inc., to include measurable performance goals for employment of persons who have a disability in a state strategic plan.
Title
Vocational Rehabilitation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died on Calendar |
2015-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-04-09 | House | Favorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 04/09/15, 9:00 am, Reed Hall |
2015-03-26 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2015-03-26 | House | CS referred to Education Committee |
2015-03-26 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2015-03-25 | House | CS by Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee read 1st time |
2015-03-25 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-03-25 | House | CS by Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-23 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee, 03/25/15, 9:00 am, Reed Hall |
2015-03-08 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0802 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died in Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
413 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
413 | 207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
413 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
413 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |