FL H1149 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires employers intending to relocate out of state or cease operation to notify DBPR; provides penalty; requires DBPR to compile list of employers that relocate or cease operation; provides that such employers are ineligible for certain benefits for specified period; requires employers to remit certain funds to DBPR; requires each state agency head to ensure certain services are performed by state contractors within state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workforce Retention

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2019-02-28HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1474 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
559952Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5599521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5599522Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5599523Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5599524Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5599525Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback