FL H1139 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3-2)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 426 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to Florida Development Finance Corporation, including membership & meeting requirements, annual reporting requirements, certain contracts, & bonds issued by corporation; specifies duties of regional economic development organizations; revises provisions relating to grant requirements, amounts, & eligibility; revises provisions relating to workforce services to replace CareerSource Florida, Inc., with state board or DEO; revises provisions relating to operation, purpose, requirements, structure, & authority of CareerSource Florida, Inc., & state board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic Development

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseLaid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 426 passed
2020-03-06HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2020-03-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-02-24HouseCS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time
2020-02-24HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-21HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-20HouseCS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0
2020-02-18HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/20/20, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2020-02-12HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2020-02-11HouseCS by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-02-11HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-10HouseCS by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2020-02-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/10/20, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2020-02-04HouseNow in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-02-04HouseFavorable by Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1
2020-01-31HouseOn Committee agenda-- Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 9:00 am, 12 HOB
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-13HouseReferred to Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2020-01-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S426 (Similar To) 2020-06-19 - Chapter No. 2020-30
H5003 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-114
H1271 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
S666 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
S1244 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101180Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1011801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2060Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288018Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2880655Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2889604Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2889605Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2889606Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2889610Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2889619Amended CodeSee Bill Text
331369Amended CodeSee Bill Text
413405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
414045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
420622Amended CodeSee Bill Text
443171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
443181Amended CodeSee Bill Text
445002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
445003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
445004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
445006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
445007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4450071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
445008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
445009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
445011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
445014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
445021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
445022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
445024Amended CodeSee Bill Text
445026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
445028Amended CodeSee Bill Text
445030Amended CodeSee Bill Text
445033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
445035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
445048Amended CodeSee Bill Text
445051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
445055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44671Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback