FL H1139 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-180
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes city to enter into supplemental contract with certain firefighters & police officers to increase amount of pension under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City Pension Fund for Firefighters and Police Officers in the City of Tampa, Hillsborough County

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#57 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#650 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09 Chapter No. 2018-180
2018-03-23 Approved by Governor
2018-03-16 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-08HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-08SenatePassed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2018-03-08SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-08SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Local Calendar, 03/08/18
2018-02-21SenateReceived
2018-02-21SenateReferred to Rules
2018-02-21SenateIn Messages
2018-02-21HousePassed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2018-02-21HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-20HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-20HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-15HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/20/18
2018-02-01HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-01HouseFavorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2018-01-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/01/18, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2018-01-23HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2018-01-23HouseFavorable by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-01-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall
2018-01-16HouseNow in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
2018-01-16HouseFavorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2018-01-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 01/16/18, 11:30 am, 12 HOB
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-07HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2018-01-02HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback