FL H1139 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Declares right to vote as fundamental right; prohibits state from restricting right to vote without compelling interest; provides equal protection of right to vote; authorizes use of violation of act as claim or defense in judicial proceeding.
Title
Elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2015-03-08 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1442 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1139 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1139/BillText/Filed/PDF |