FL H1123 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits unlawful sale of alcoholic beverages at commercial establishment or keeping or maintaining of place where alcoholic beverages are sold; specifies conditions under which sites that have violated prohibition on unlawful sale of alcoholic beverages may be declared public nuisance.
Title
Unlawful Sale Of Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | Rep. Doug Bankson [R] | Rep. Taylor Yarkosky [R] |
Rep. Bruce Antone [D] | Rep. Dana Trabulsy [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | Laid on Table |
2024-02-23 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-23 | House | Original reference removed: Commerce Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2024-02-22 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-22 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-22 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-19 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2024-02-07 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-02-07 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-06 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-06 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-02-02 | House | Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-09 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-01-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1090 (Similar To) 2024-04-12 - Chapter No. 2024-77
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
562 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 138 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |