FL H1121 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits anchorage of vessels in certain areas; provides civil penalties.
Title
City of Fort Lauderdale, Broward County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2016-01-19 | House | Now in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2016-01-19 | House | Favorable by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 1 |
2016-01-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local Government Affairs Subcommittee, 01/19/16, 12:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-05 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1121 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1121/BillText/Filed/PDF |