FL H1121 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1103
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1103
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Office Of Financial Regulation (OFR) to appoint provisional directors or executive officers; specifies which accounting principles must be followed by financial institutions; authorizes OFR to conduct additional examinations of financial institutions if warranted; revises criteria for approval of financial entity's plan of conversion; provides for transfer of assets from federally chartered or out-of-state chartered institution; revises provisions relating to banker's banks, etc.
Title
Financial Institutions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#49 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#420 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#420 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1103 | |
2011-05-03 | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; Budget; Rules -SJ 751 | |
2011-05-02 | Received -SJ 714 | |
2011-04-29 | In Messages | |
2011-04-29 | Read 2nd time -HJ 945 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/11 | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 619 | |
2011-04-12 | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 619 | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 601 | |
2011-04-06 | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/08/11, 8:45 am, 404 HOB | |
2011-03-29 | Now in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee -HJ 366 | |
2011-03-28 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-03-23 | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -HJ 342 | |
2011-03-21 | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/23/11, 1:00 pm, 404 HOB | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 210 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 97 | |
2011-03-02 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
288 | 772 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 99 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 730 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9885 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 03855 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 044 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 411 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 414 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 416 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 417 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 418 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 4185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 419 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 947 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
657 | 038 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
657 | 042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
657 | 063 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
657 | 064 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
658 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
658 | 165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
658 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
658 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
658 | 295 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
658 | 2953 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
658 | 296 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
658 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
658 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
658 | 48 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
658 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
658 | 65 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
658 | 67 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
665 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
667 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |