FL H1117 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts certain activities involving marijuana from use & possession offenses; authorizes persons age 21 & over to engage in certain activities involving personal use of marijuana in limited amounts; provides for licensure of marijuana establishments that may engage in manufacture or sell of marijuana, marijuana products & marijuana accessories; provides for limits on number of retail marijuana stores in localities; provides standards for prospective licensees & restrictions on location of marijuana establishments; authorizes localities to prohibit one or more types of marijuana establishments; provides an exemption from specified provisions for marijuana research.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adult Use Marijuana Legalization

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-02-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1119 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S1780 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
S1782 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20165Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
500105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
561025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56213Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5660311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566034Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566036Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566037Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566038Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566039Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566040Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566042Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5690073Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893135Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback