FL H1117 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DOH to develop instrument to determine clinical eligibility for CMS program; specifies minimum requirements for clinical eligibility; provides for appeal of determination of clinical ineligibility; provides exemption from regional specialty plan enrollment limits for CMS Network.
Title
Children's Medical Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Health Quality Subcommittee |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1240 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
391 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
391 | 029 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
391 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 974 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1117 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1117/BillText/Filed/PDF |