FL H1115 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises requirements for calculation of additional FTE membership & certain bonuses based on IB examination scores of students to include students who earn equivalent scores as determined by DOE.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Education Finance Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-27 - House - House Choice & Innovation Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-05HouseDied in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
2023-03-28HouseNow in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
2023-03-28HouseReferred to Education & Employment Committee
2023-03-28HouseReferred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
2023-03-28House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2023-03-27HouseCS Filed
2023-03-27HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2023-03-27HouseReported out of Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
2023-03-27HouseFavorable with CS by Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
2023-03-23HouseAdded to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee agenda
2023-03-07House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2023-02-28HouseNow in Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
2023-02-28HouseReferred to Education & Employment Committee
2023-02-28HouseReferred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
2023-02-28HouseReferred to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
2023-02-23HouseFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101162Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback