FL H1113 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Chapter No. 2019-100
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring health maintenance organization to be cost-effective and to offer high value; authorizing the Department of Management Services to limit the number of HMOs that it contracts with in each region; authorizing the Department of Management Services to limit the number of HMOs that it contracts with in each region; requiring the department to offer, as a voluntary supplemental benefit option, certain international prescription services; authorizing individual and group health insurers and health maintenance organizations to offer shared savings incentive programs to insureds and subscribers, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#36 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#379 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#70 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12 Chapter No. 2019-100
2019-06-12 Approved by Governor
2019-06-10 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-03HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2019-05-03SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 1
2019-05-03SenateConcurred in House amendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) (205125)
2019-05-03SenateIn returning messages
2019-05-03HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 105 NAYS 2
2019-05-03HouseConcurred in Senate amendment(s) as amended (640584)
2019-05-03HouseAmendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) adopted (205125) 1282
2019-05-01HouseIn returning messages
2019-05-01SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2019-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-30SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-30SenateAmendment(s) adopted (640584)
2019-04-30SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-30SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 524
2019-04-30SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-30SenateWithdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations
2019-04-22SenateReceived
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations
2019-04-18SenateIn Messages
2019-04-11HouseCS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-03HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-04-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/03/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-25HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-25HouseFavorable by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-03-21HouseOn Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 03/25/19, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-18HouseNow in Ways and Means Committee
2019-03-15HouseCS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-15HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-13HouseCS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2019-03-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Market Reform Subcommittee, 03/13/19, 12:30 pm, Mashburn Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S524 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1113
H5009 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
110123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11012303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11012315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
287056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276387Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276648Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64131076Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1113
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1113/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1113/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1113/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1113/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1113/Amendment/687067/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1113/Amendment/151688/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1113/Amendment/244914/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1113/Amendment/640584/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1113/Amendment/205125/PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1113/Vote/HouseVote_h01113c1070.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1113/Vote/SenateVote_h01113c1012.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1113/Vote/HouseVote_h01113c1379.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1113/Vote/SenateVote_h01113c1036.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback