FL H1113 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides exceptions to general law; provides that governing body of Palm Beach County may appoint two additional commissioners to housing authority & remove or suspend same.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Palm Beach County Housing Authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#52 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#600 (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-30 Vetoed by Governor
2018-03-16 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-08HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-08SenatePassed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2018-03-08SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-08SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Local Calendar, 03/08/18
2018-02-20SenateReceived
2018-02-20SenateReferred to Rules
2018-02-14SenateIn Messages
2018-02-14HousePassed; YEAS 112 NAYS 1
2018-02-14HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-14HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-08HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/18
2018-02-01HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-01HouseFavorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2018-01-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/01/18, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2018-01-25HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2018-01-24HouseFavorable by Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2018-01-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Public Integrity and Ethics Committee, 01/24/18, 11:30 am, Sumner Hall
2018-01-16HouseNow in Public Integrity and Ethics Committee
2018-01-16HouseFavorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 01/16/18, 11:30 am, 12 HOB
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-07HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; Government Accountability Committee
2018-01-02HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback