FL H1109 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires State Surgeon General to sign & become party to specified memorandum of understanding on behalf of DOH; provides reporting requirements for certain persons who ship compounded human drug products interstate.
Title
Distribution of Compounded Human Drug Products
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Now in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2022-01-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1096 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
H693 (Similar To) 2022-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 768
H693 (Similar To) 2022-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 768
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1109 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1109/BillText/Filed/PDF |