FL H1107 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 468 (Ch. 2013-66), CS/SB 1770 (Ch. 2013-60)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 468 (Ch. 2013-66), CS/SB 1770 (Ch. 2013-60)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises definition of term "corporation" for purposes relating to Florida Hurricane Catastrophe Fund; deletes outdated coverage level; revises coverage levels available under reimbursement contract; revises aggregate coverage limits; provides for phase-in of changes to coverage levels & limits; revises exemption of medical malpractice insurance premiums from emergency assessments if certain revenues are determined to be insufficient to fund obligations, costs, & expenses of Florida Hurricane Catastrophe Fund & Florida Hurricane Catastrophe Fund Finance Corporation; changes name of Florida Hurricane Catastrophe Fund Finance Corporation; deletes provisions relating to temporary emergency options for additional coverage.
Title
Florida Hurricane Catastrophe Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Ronald Renuart [R] | House Regulatory Affairs Committee | House Insurance and Banking Subcommittee | Rep. Bill Hager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 468 (Ch. 2013-66), CS/SB 1770 (Ch. 2013-60) |
2013-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-04-19 | House | CS/CS by Regulatory Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2013-04-19 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-04-16 | House | CS/CS by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 1 |
2013-04-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 04/16/13, 9:00 am, 404 HOB |
2013-04-10 | House | Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2013-04-10 | House | Favorable by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1 |
2013-04-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/10/13, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2013-04-03 | House | Now in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee |
2013-04-02 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-04-02 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-28 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/28/13, 8:00 am, 404 HOB |
2013-03-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/13/13, 9:00 am, 404 HOB --Workshopped |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0635 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 157 (Ch. 2013-190), CS/HB 1191 (Ch. 2013-209), CS/CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2013-160), SB 356 (Ch. 2013-125), CS/CS/SB 468 (Ch. 2013-66), CS/SB 1842 (Ch. 2013-101)
H0909 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1770 (Ch. 2013-60), SB 1850 (Ch. 2013-61)
H1055 (Similar To) 2013-02-27 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1770 (Ch. 2013-60)
S0468 (Similar To) 2013-05-30 - Chapter No. 2013-66
S1046 (Similar To) 2013-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 157 (Ch. 2013-190), CS/HB 1191 (Ch. 2013-209), CS/CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2013-160), SB 356 (Ch. 2013-125), CS/CS/SB 468 (Ch. 2013-66), CS/SB 1842 (Ch. 2013-101)
S1262 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1770 (Ch. 2013-60)
S1770 (Similar To) 2013-05-29 - Chapter No. 2013-60, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1850 (Ch. 2013-61)
H0909 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1770 (Ch. 2013-60), SB 1850 (Ch. 2013-61)
H1055 (Similar To) 2013-02-27 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1770 (Ch. 2013-60)
S0468 (Similar To) 2013-05-30 - Chapter No. 2013-66
S1046 (Similar To) 2013-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 157 (Ch. 2013-190), CS/HB 1191 (Ch. 2013-209), CS/CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2013-160), SB 356 (Ch. 2013-125), CS/CS/SB 468 (Ch. 2013-66), CS/SB 1842 (Ch. 2013-101)
S1262 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1770 (Ch. 2013-60)
S1770 (Similar To) 2013-05-29 - Chapter No. 2013-60, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1850 (Ch. 2013-61)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 555 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 0629 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |