FL H1103 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 439 (Ch. 2015-92)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Creates "Patent Troll Prevention Act"; prohibits bad faith assertions of patent infringement from being made; provides factors that courts may consider when determining whether allegation was or was not made in bad faith; authorizes courts to require patent infringement plaintiff to post bond under certain circumstances; limits bond amount; authorizes courts to waive bond requirement in certain circumstances; authorizes private rights of action for violations; authorizes courts to award certain relief to prevailing plaintiffs; provides exemptions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Patent Infringement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 439 (Ch. 2015-92)
2015-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-04-10HouseCS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2015-04-09HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-04-08HouseCS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2015-04-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/08/15, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2015-03-18HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2015-03-18HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2015-03-17HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-17HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2015-03-13HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/17/15, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2015-03-08HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1084 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 439 (Ch. 2015-92)
S1362 (Similar To) 2015-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 439 (Ch. 2015-92)
H0439 (Similar To) 2015-06-03 - Chapter No. 2015-92

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
501991Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501992Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501993Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501994Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501995Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501996Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501997Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback