FL H1101 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises definitions of terms "anesthesiologist" & "direct supervision"; revises requirements for written protocol between anesthesiologist assistant & supervising anesthesiologist; revises duties & functions anesthesiologist assistants may perform; revises licensure requirements for anesthesiologist assistants.
Title
Anesthesiologist Assistants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Professions & Public Health Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Professions & Public Health Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died on Second Reading Calendar |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-17 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2022-02-07 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-02-04 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-03 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-03 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-03 | House | Reported out of Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2022-02-02 | House | Favorable with CS by Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2022-01-31 | House | Added to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Now in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2022-01-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1366 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
458 | 3475 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |