FL H1101 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemption from public records requirements for clinical records & inspection reports held by an advanced birth center; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec./Advanced Birth Centers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | House | Now in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee |
2018-01-16 | House | Favorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 01/16/18, 11:30 am, Mashburn Hall |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-07 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-12-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1099 (Related) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
S1564 (Similar To) 2018-02-27 - Withdrawn from further consideration
S1564 (Similar To) 2018-02-27 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
383 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 325 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1101 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1101/BillText/Filed/PDF |