FL H1099 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-21 - CS Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits insurers under specified policies from declining or limiting coverages & discriminating against persons based solely on their status as living organ donors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Living Organ Donors in Insurance Policies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-20 - House - House Finance & Facilities Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-21HouseCS Filed
2022-01-21HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2022-01-21HouseReported out of Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
2022-01-20HouseFavorable with CS by Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
2022-01-18HouseAdded to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee agenda
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-10HouseNow in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
2022-01-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1026 (Same As) 2022-01-20 - Now in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62697075Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback