FL H1099 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Chapter No. 2019-178
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creating an overlay district; providing boundaries; providing exception to general law; requires DBPR to issue special alcoholic beverage license to certain establishments; providing penalties; prohibiting subsequent licensure application for specified period.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City of Kissimmee, Osceola County

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#35 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#102 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08 Chapter No. 2019-178
2019-05-10 Approved by Governor
2019-05-09 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-01HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-05-01SenatePassed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2019-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-01SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-05-01SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on Local Calendar, 05/01/19
2019-04-16SenateReceived
2019-04-12SenateReferred to Rules
2019-04-11SenateIn Messages
2019-04-11HousePassed; YEAS 114 NAYS 1
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-03-28HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-28HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2019-03-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/28/19, 10:30 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-19HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-19HouseFavorable by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-03-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 11:30 am, Webster Hall
2019-03-12HouseNow in Business and Professions Subcommittee
2019-03-12HouseFavorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-03-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/12/19, 8:30 am, 12 HOB
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Business and Professions Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-02-26HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback