FL H1087 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits Medicaid managed care plans from using providers who provide services exclusively through telehealth to achieve network adequacy; prohibits certain health insurer & HMOs from denying coverage for covered services provided through telehealth; prohibits health insurers & HMOs from excluding covered services provided through telehealth from coverage; provides reimbursement requirements & cost-sharing limitations for health insurers & HMOs relating to telehealth services; prohibits health insurers & HMOs from requiring insureds & subscribers to receive services through telehealth; authorizes health insurers & HMOs to conduct utilization reviews; authorizes health insurers & HMOs to limit telehealth services to certain providers; removes requirements for contracts between certain health insurers or HMOs & telehealth providers; requires certain small employer benefit plans to comply with certain requirements for reimbursement of telehealth services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance Coverage for Telehealth Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-14HouseDied in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
2022-03-12HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-10HouseNow in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
2022-01-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S726 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
409967Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62742396Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276699Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64131093Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback