FL H1087 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits for-profit eye banks from procuring certain human organs & tissue for specified purposes; provides certain exceptions.
Title
Procurement Activities of For-profit Eye Banks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - House Finance & Facilities Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported out of Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-03-24 | House | Favorable by Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Added to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-25 | House | Now in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S536 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 542 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
873 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |