FL H1085 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires notification of primary care physician if sickle cell trait is detected in newborns & infants; requires DOH to develop & maintain registry for such newborns & infants; requires department to establish Sickle Cell Disease Education & Grant Program; requires AHCA to conduct certain annual review & study; requires Medicaid managed care plans to develop & implement sickle cell disease quality strategy plans; requires health insurance policies & health maintenance contracts to provide coverage for fertility preservation services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sickle Cell Disease

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-10HouseNow in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
2022-01-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1652 (Similar To) 2022-01-18 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
383147Amended CodeSee Bill Text
385213Amended CodeSee Bill Text
385214Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40991191Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40991192Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4099751Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62764192Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64131078Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback