FL H1079 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits nongovernmental entities to use state funds in specified ways; requires operational audits of certain nongovernmental entities; requires nongovernmental entities to provide annual report; requires state agencies to provide reports in format prescribed by Chief Inspector General to certain entities; requires nongovernmental entities to submit certain attestations before receiving state funds.
Title
Fiscal Accountability for Nongovernmental Entities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#486 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Received |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-02-09 | Senate | In Messages |
2022-02-02 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0 |
2022-02-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-01 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-02-01 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-02-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-01-27 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/1/2022) |
2022-01-27 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-01-27 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-01-26 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-01-26 | House | CS Filed |
2022-01-26 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-01-26 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | PCS added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-12-29 | House | Filed |