FL H1077 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits certain employers or employment agencies from engaging in certain activities relating to wages & benefits; authorizes employer or employment agency to confirm wage or salary history under certain conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employee Wage and Salary History

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30HouseDied in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-25HouseNow in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-02-25HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-02-17HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H107 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
S256 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Commerce and Tourism

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1120445Amended CodeSee Bill Text
448111Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback