FL H1077 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies powers & duties of Division of Public Assistance Fraud; prohibits individual working for entity covered by State Risk Management Trust Fund from engaging in retaliatory conduct against sexual harassment victim; revises provisions relating membership of Board of Funeral, Cemetery, & Consumer Services; provides for disqualification of applicants for licensure under ch. 497, F.S., upon conviction of certain offenses; prohibits persons from engaging in certain activities requiring licensure without holding required licenses; prohibits certain actions to influence firesafety inspector; provides persons serving as volunteer firefighters may serve as regular or permanent firefighter for limited period; prohibits false personation of certain personnel; provides investigations component of DFS is criminal justice agency.
Title
Department of Financial Services
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | House Insurance and Banking Subcommittee | Rep. Chip LaMarca [R] | Rep. Clovis Watson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died on Calendar |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-18 | House | CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-18 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-13 | House | CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 1 |
2020-02-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/13/20, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2020-01-28 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | CS referred to Commerce Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-01-27 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-27 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-21 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 01/21/20, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2020-01-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1404 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
H1263 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
S1594 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
H1263 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
S1594 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
284 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 1411 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 142 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 157 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 159 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 459 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
552 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 7921 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 2815 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 217 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 416 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
843 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |